Financial history DERBY BASS STREET CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (CHURCH)

Charity number: 1169706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.86k £16.19k £21.91k £15.86k £18.95k
Total expenditure £11.41k £12.75k £19.33k £23.23k £14.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A