THE SUIT WORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Suit Works is a free service based in the Sheffield City Region to help unemployed people to succeed at interview by building confidence through personal styling. Clients referred to the charity are given formal clothing (which they keep)and a styling session to help them look fantastic, feel confident and perform well. This unique service in the region removes a basic barrier to employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,029 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Harwood | Chair | 07 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Victoria Brown | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Jeffery | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Headford | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alexis Foster | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.55k | £56.67k | £44.83k | £56.01k | £78.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.06k | £49.66k | £53.47k | £46.68k | £66.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £16.67k | £16.47k | £26.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £20.12k | £7.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Carver Street
Carver House
Sheffield
S1 4FS
- Phone:
- 07468464776
- Email:
- info@thesuitworks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window