EAST PENNARD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Establish and run a Village Hall and to promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of East Pennard the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation and with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arabella Browne | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Allen | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cerys Ross-Evans | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Letchford | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine May Dorcas Bryant | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Page | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARRY GIFFORD | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Adrian Vokes Pearse | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Anna Elizabeth Gifford | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUGH RICHARD HOWARD TRIPP | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Mary Derby | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|||||
LISA BRITTON | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £783 | £2.40k | £23.56k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £838 | £2.72k | £23.01k | £5.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2022 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2022 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST PENNARD ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MANOR
COLLEGE GREEN
EAST PENNARD
SHEPTON MALLET
BA4 6SA
- Phone:
- 01458850240
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window