WESLEY CENTRE, HARROGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage premises which provide for regular acts of worship for members of the Methodist Church and non-members alike, and for worship for other Christian denominations. We seek to promote the whole mission of the Church by reaching out into the community, staging special events, services and concerts; and we provide facilities for other charities and community services at discounted rates
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin Paul Clowes | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Rev Gordon Hay | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Donald Lighton Rolls | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Wheatley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Ann Yeats | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Edward Walton | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Michael Greenberg | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY RUNCORN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Leslie Andrew Sudron | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Eleanor Jeanette Borkett | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.92k | £158.17k | £127.76k | £108.65k | £128.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.45k | £127.04k | £113.27k | £126.57k | £115.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEPT 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wesley Centre
Oxford Street
HARROGATE
HG1 1PP
- Phone:
- 01423509917
- Website:
-
wesleycentreharrogate.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window