CHRISTIAN GOLD HOUSE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Religious Services to all groups around the world through worship, religious studies, evangelism, crusades and social media. The church building will a charitable community hub for use by groups of all backgrounds within the Kensington and Fairfield areas for charitable activities after renovation. Activities will include Heritage Tour, community meeting and events, soup kitchen etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £43,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £43,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 2016: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN GOLD HOUSE CHAPEL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nyarai Sanganza | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Tchum | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev SAMUEL FREMPONG SARPONG | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.23k | £96.16k | £68.10k | £102.54k | £168.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.80k | £37.91k | £61.10k | £102.54k | £125.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £43.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.60k | £10.00k | £42.25k | £43.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 25 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
170 KENSINGTON
ADJACENT KENSINGTON LIBRARY
LIVERPOOL
MERSEYSIDE
L7 2RJ
- Phone:
- 07962665090
- Email:
- cghmin7@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window