TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH SHARROWVALE WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The focus of Sharrowvale Wesleyan Reform Church is to serve God in the local area of Sheffield and further afield. We are a local church who meet regularly to study the Bible together. We run a monthly film club, a weekly toddler group and are involved in a variety of more informal activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 May 1979: Standard registration
- 02 March 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1187108 THE CROWDED HOUSE COLLECTIVE
- SHARROWVALE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- TCH SHARROWVALE (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.44k | £360.83k | £342.71k | £267.05k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.14k | £313.67k | £373.15k | £212.76k | £664.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
A MANSE OR A PLACE OF RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER
Area of benefit
SHARROWVALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window