SOEL CONNECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Soel Connect runs a gospel music group / choir which seeks to bring hope to our communities through music and arts. Our aim is to pioneer in restoring and rebuilding the brokenness within our communities by leading with our sound and encouraging people to take part in life-changing musical experiences. Our activities and involvements enable social integration, interconnectedness and self-worth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £48,605 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 15 February 2017: CIO registration
- THE NOW CREW (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Muriithi | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenechi Nwaki | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Simukoko | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
FEMI DAVID | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
EMMANUEL OLUWAMAYOWA | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
OTOKONI OKWULEHIE | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.73k | £8.21k | £3.17k | £41.25k | £53.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.04k | £8.66k | £2.30k | £27.14k | £35.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.92k | £48.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY GOSPEL MUSIC GROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Theatre Y Crwys
77 Richmond Road
CARDIFF
CF24 3AR
- Phone:
- 01792946137
- Email:
- contactus@soelconnect.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window