Accounts and annual returns SPARK

Charity number: 1171214
Charity reporting is up to date (132 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 13 March 2025 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 13 March 2025 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2023 22 July 2024 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 22 July 2024 264 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2022 12 March 2023 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 24 April 2023 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 09 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 09 November 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 30 April 2021 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 30 April 2021 180 days late Download Open in new window