CHIPPERFIELD BURIAL GROUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has obtained from Dacorum Borough Council a lease for 125 yrs for the burial ground. The Trust continues to manage the burial ground in Chipperfield, and volunteers are cutting the grass and doing regular maintenance. The trust is looking after the hedge as it grows; there are now a total of 3 graves and one interment of ashes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN SEBASTIAN MORRILL MA - OXON | Chair | 04 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Janet King | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Bunker | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Foxall | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael JOSEPH BSc Hons | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Michelle PAPWORTH | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALFRED VIGOR FRICS RETD | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ARTHUR GOOD | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY THOMPSON | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.83k | £4.16k | £4.87k | £4.88k | £4.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.52k | £1.97k | £4.29k | £6.46k | £712 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £750 | £750 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 ESTABLISH AND PROVIDE A NEW BURIAL GROUND TO BE AVAILABLE TO THE PEOPLE RESIDING IN EITHER THE CIVIL OR ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPERFIELD OR ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (MEANING THOSE WITHIN THE AREA COVERED BY DACORUM BOROUGH COUNCIL FOR THE TIME BEING) AND WHO WISH TO BE BURIED IN CHIPPERFIELD 3.2 UNDERTAKE ITSELF OR PROCURE THE ENTIRE MANAGEMENT OF THE BURIAL GROUND 3.3 HOLD AND ADMINISTER THE BURIAL GROUND IN TRUST TO ALLOW ENJOYMENT THEREOF BY THE PUBLIC AS AN OPEN SPACE UNDER PROPER CONTROL AND REGULATION 3.4 MAINTAIN AND KEEP THE BURIAL GROUND IN A GOOD AND DECENT STATE OF REPAIR
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Wing
Commonwood House
Commonwood
KINGS LANGLEY
HERTS
WD4 9BA
- Phone:
- 01923263182
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window