ST GEORGE'S HOSPITAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St George's Hospital Charity was formerly registered under the same name but with charity registration number 241527. The purpose of St George's Hospital Charity is to support St George's University Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust in its delivery of care to patients at St George's and Queen Mary's Hospital and in the wider Merton and Wandsworth communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,933,000
Donations and legacies | £2.55m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £379.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,061,000
Raising funds | £1.49m | |
Charitable activities | £2.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£709,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.49m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.57m |
People

25 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
81 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 12 July 1996: Standard registration
- 29 April 1997: Funds transferred to 241527 ST GEORGE'S HOSPITAL CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES
- 29 April 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 04 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Walker | Chair | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pankaj Shashikant Dave | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Derek Macallan | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Leigh Hudson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachna Upadhya | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hayward | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Renuka Dent | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Greenspan | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ms Sarah Margaret Wilton | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Sarfaty | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Schellion Jill Horn | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STEPHEN JOHN RAPPOLT | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14m | £4.16m | £2.09m | £2.50m | £2.93m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82m | £4.18m | £3.31m | £3.97m | £4.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.39m | £3.58m | £1.57m | £2.00m | £2.55m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £50.00k | £15.00k | £19.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £212.00k | £197.00k | £160.00k | £150.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £483.00k | £370.00k | £344.00k | £356.00k | £379.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £274.00k | £392.00k | £126.00k | £451.00k | £979.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.12m | £3.56m | £2.52m | £2.72m | £2.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £706.00k | £619.00k | £789.00k | £1.25m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.00k | £38.00k | £34.00k | £19.00k | £28.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.77m | £3.14m | £1.96m | £2.03m | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £64.00k | £61.00k | £67.00k | £60.00k | £59.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.28m | £1.28m | £1.29m | £1.75m | £1.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.13m | £15.23m | £16.09m | £14.17m | £13.49m | |
|
Other assets | £689.00k | £2.27m | £546.00k | £451.00k | £348.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.44m | £3.75m | £3.43m | £4.09m | £3.73m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES: RELATING TO THE GENERAL OR ANY SPECIFIC PURPOSES OF THE FOUNDATION TRUST OR THE PURPOSES OF THE HEALTH SERVICE; (B) TO PROMOTE, PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ADVANCE ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC; AND (C) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION IN HEALTH CARE, INCLUDING BY ENGAGING IN AND SUPPORTING HEALTH-RELATED RESEARCH (AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS) INCLUDING AT ST GEORGE'S, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON.
Linked charities
- 12 July 1996 : Standard registration
- 29 April 1997 : Asset transfer out
- 29 April 1997 : Removed
- 04 July 2001 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GEORGES HOSPITAL
BLACKSHAW ROAD
LONDON
SW17 0QT
- Phone:
- 02087254522
- Email:
- giving@stgeorges.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window