Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS OCKBROOK
Charity number: 1168870

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV TIM SUMPTER | Chair | 01 April 2000 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Carol Holt | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jill Coxon BA | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Ruth Peel | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Cullen B Sc | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Throsby | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Cullen BSC | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wallace | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Beaver | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret James | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roderick Alec James | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miachael Charles Allwood | Trustee | 03 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN SHAW | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DR MIKE ALLWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.