SEAVIEW VILLAGE REGATTA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Seaview Village Regatta provides an annual sporting event in the village of Seaview on the Isle of Wight. These activities are open to all residents and resident visitors of the villages of Seaview and Nettlestone. The sports include sailing, Tug-of-War, Swimming, Diving, Children's Beach Sports, small-engine motor boat racing and sea rowing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 20 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANNE EVANS | Chair | 23 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
Robert Murray Blake Holmes | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD COTTERELL | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Birchenough | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ALAISTER NIMMO | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.20k | £19.25k | £21.25k | £34.19k | £40.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.72k | £3.98k | £28.99k | £36.46k | £38.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR SPORTING COMPETITION IN THE SEAVIEW VILLAGE REGATTA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linsay
Fairy Road
SEAVIEW
PO34 5HF
- Phone:
- 01983615909
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window