Financial history THE SCHOOL OF MEDITATION

Charity Number: 1171296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.43k £82.49k £132.65k £125.74k £151.91k
Total expenditure £168.41k £138.26k £123.61k £131.52k £157.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A