THE HAVEN PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide mental health support to people living with Personality Disorder or Complex Trauma based on abuse, including all forms of sexual abuse and neglect. 90% of clients are helped with past sexual abuse trauma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 18 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brewis Christine | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Margaret Lorimer | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Tweed | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mann | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAORU MAGEE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.25k | £155.25k | £179.62k | £205.71k | £125.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.00k | £159.76k | £159.76k | £183.53k | £162.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £125.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £78.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 May 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 May 2021 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN NORTH ESSEX THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO HELP PEOPLE WITH PERSONALITY DISORDERS TO RECOVER AND TO SUSTAIN THAT RECOVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HAVEN PROJECT
10 ST. PETERS COURT
MIDDLEBOROUGH
COLCHESTER
CO1 1WD
- Phone:
- 01206572215
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window