Financial history THE LOUGHBOROUGH MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 508706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.27k £47.22k £67.49k £67.58k £52.95k
Total expenditure £40.43k £25.57k £42.25k £58.62k £45.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A