THE LOUGHBOROUGH MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DAILY PRAYERS RELIGOUS EDUCATION COMMUNITY EVENTS COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES RELIGEOUS TALKS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 September 1979: Standard registration
- LOUGHBOROUGH MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE LOUGHBOROUGH ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Shamsu Ali | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shah Mashuk Miah | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shiful Islam | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Lukman Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Jabir Miah | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Jashim Uddin | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abdul Hye | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Haroon Rashid | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Soil Miah | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nurul Amin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Faysal Choudhury | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sabbir Ahmed | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZ MOHAMMED AWLAD HUSSAIN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gulaap Miah | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Monsur Ahmed | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.27k | £47.22k | £67.49k | £67.58k | £52.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.43k | £25.57k | £42.25k | £58.62k | £45.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/06/1978 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FAITH OF ISLAM AND THE ISLAMIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE ADMINISTRATION OF A MUSLIM GRAVEYARD, THE ARRANGEMENT OF PROPER FUNERAL SERVICES FOR MULSIMS AND THE ORGANISATIONS OF ISLAMIC CONFERENCES, RELIGIOUS MEETINGS, SEMINARS AND ISLAMIC FESTIVALS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND PARTICULARLY THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loughborough Mosque
85 King Street
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE11 1SB
- Phone:
- 07542008570
- Email:
- lmica1@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window