THE SPACE @ FIELD LANE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group was formed to take over what was a derelict building previously known as the Field Lane Community Centre, The Group raised funding in order to refurbish the facility and the building opened in September 2019 as a bright and airy community hub which now houses a variety of services, activities and a community cafe all with the aim of pursuing the objects of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 18 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amber Ray | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Brownridge | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Frances Louise Caldwell | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jim Bridge | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trafford Carroll | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Warren Nicholls | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gomersal | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £525.42k | £75.95k | £58.39k | £76.41k | £77.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.99k | £72.11k | £98.80k | £116.56k | £105.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.45k | £19.85k | £4.89k | £980 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £512.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £72.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT AND ENABLE THE RESIDENTS OF FIELD LANE AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY OF RASTRICK AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISTIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE LEARNING, EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS IN THE AREA AND IN FURTHERING THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES THE TRUSTEES WILL: - ENCOURAGE COMMUNITY MEMBERS TO PARTICIPATE IN A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS; AND - HELP COMMUNITY MEMBERS TO PARTICIPATE IN THE LIFE OF THE CENTRE, TO EXPRESS THEIR VIEWS AND PLAY AN ACTIVE PART IN THE PLANNING AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE AND THEIR OWN ACTIVITIES CREATING A SENSE OF COMMUNITY OWNERSHIP. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE (TO BE KNOWN AS THE SPACE @ FIELD LANE) AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Space @ Field Lane
Burnsall Road
BRIGHOUSE
HD6 3JT
- Phone:
- 01484 556924
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window