MAYOR OF BOURNEMOUTH'S CHARITY APPEAL

Charity number: 1170029
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

REVENUE IS GENERATED VIA FUNDRAISING EVENTS AND FROM DONATIONS BY INDIVIDUALS AND LOCAL FIRMS/GROUPS. NO TRUSTEES' RENUMERATION IS PAID. SUPPORTS CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITHIN BOURNEMOUTH OR OTHER LOCAL CHARITABLE PROJECTS WHICH THE TRUSTEES DEEM WORTHY. PROMOTES SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY BE DETERMINED. THE ORGANISATION IS NON-PARTY AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 May 2019

Total income: £36,717
Total expenditure: £39,459

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 2016: CIO registration
  • 25 January 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 25 January 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/05/2017 24/05/2018 30/05/2019
Total gross income £85.63k £52.83k £36.72k
Total expenditure £80.54k £50.32k £39.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 May 2019 24 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 March 2020 On Time
Annual return 24 May 2018 22 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2018 22 March 2019 On Time
Annual return 25 May 2017 08 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2017 08 March 2018 On Time