CRADLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to maintain the Village Hall for the communal benefit of the inhabitants of the Diocean Parish of Cradley including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation. The Management Committee aims to provide first class hall facilities, at an affordable cost, to voluntary organisations serving the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £12,325
Total expenditure: £18,081

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR JEFF WHITE Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Booth Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Pamela Lesley Moss Trustee 16 April 2024
None on record
Susan Gale Humphreys Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Peter John Warner Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Ivan Smart Trustee 17 January 2023
AVONCROFT MUSEUM OF HISTORIC BUILDINGS
Received: On time
Julia Elizabeth Maclagan Trustee 16 September 2014
None on record
MARGARET EDGAR Trustee 14 October 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, CRADLEY
Received: On time
MRS JAN DAMPNEY Trustee 10 September 2011
None on record
MR KEN NASON Trustee
None on record
MR CHRIS LOWDER Trustee
None on record
MR TERRY ROBSHAW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.33k £23.44k £11.26k £17.18k £12.33k
Total expenditure £11.97k £9.14k £14.72k £15.91k £18.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.63k £21.31k £3.49k £3.50k £3.48k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 02 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Applegarth
Bosbury Road
Cradley
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR13 5LT
Phone:
01886880541