Accounts and annual returns ACT FOR CHILDREN (ACT)

Charity number: 1173180
Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
Annual return 19 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
Annual return 19 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days
Annual return 19 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1359 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1359 days
Annual return 19 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days