THERESA'S TINY TREASURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has provide over 700 families losing a longed for baby with assistance since 2016 in West Norfolk. Offered to all families accessing the service are: Bereavement photography, hand and footprints onto ceramic, into glass and plaster castings of baby's hands and feet, memory boxes and many other keepsakes. Parents, siblings and extended family are provided with hand made keepsakes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 08 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THERESA ANN MCGRATH | Chair | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZY DUHIG | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARA HUTTON | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DINA COSTA | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MCCABE | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SUMNER | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE VENTHEM | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.63k | £15.19k | £36.04k | £19.11k | £21.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.06k | £12.07k | £37.35k | £17.49k | £22.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THIS CIO BEING ESTABLISHED IS TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AMONGST PARENTS AND FAMILIES' RESIDENT IN NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE EXPERIENCE THE LOSS OF A BABY THROUGH MISCARRIAGE, STILLBIRTH AND NEONATAL DEATH BY; (1) SUPPORTING NEWLY BEREAVED PARENTS BY THE PROVISION OF PHOTOGRAPHY AND THE MAKING OF KEEPSAKES OF THEIR CHOICE AND AT THEIR REQUEST. (2) PROVIDING A SERVICE TO THE QUEEN ELIZABETH HOSPITAL, KINGS LYNN, NORFOLK, WITH A DAYTIME ON CALL SERVICE TO ATTEND FAMILIES' WHO WISH TO TAKE ADVANTAGE OF THE SERVICE. (3) PROVIDING ONGOING SUPPORT AT HOME WITH A LISTENING SERVICE WITH PRACTICAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON WHERE TO SEEK HELP AND ADVICE FROM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ROLFE CRESCENT
HEACHAM
KING'S LYNN
PE31 7SF
- Phone:
- 01485570767
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window