Accounts and annual returns HALAL SEALED PRODUCTS
Charity Number: 1170910

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2024 | 693 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2024 | 710 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2024 | 1058 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2024 | 1075 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window