Financial history WOLFENDEN SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 508716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36 £50 £51 £52 £52
Total expenditure £25 £0 £0 £1 £1
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A