Accounts and annual returns KENT THANET TAMIL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1171247
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 29 April 2024 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 07 March 2023 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 07 March 2023 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 February 2022 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 February 2022 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 03 March 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 03 March 2021 64 days late Download Open in new window