Trustees KENT THANET TAMIL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1171247

Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THAVAKUMAR THAMOTHARAMPILLAI | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEELIPAN RAJAMOHAN | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
GOPALAPILLAY VINOTHARAJA | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAVEENDRAN VALLIPURANATHAN | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajakumar Sinnathurai | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
AJAY AATHI | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
VANITHARAN NAVARATNAM | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIVASOTHY KIRUPAKARAN | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.