Accounts and annual returns FLEETWOOD GYMNASIUM CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity Number: 508718
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 28 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 28 April 2014 On Time