THORNTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages Thornton's playing field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WHITWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH RONALD HAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17TH JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
FREEHOLD LAND ON TRUST TO PERMIT THE ERECTION OF A VILLAGE HALL OR RECREATION ROOM TO BE USED IN PERPETUITY FOR THE PURPOSE ORF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECUTURAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO ALLOW THE SAID VILLAGE HALL TO BE REPAIRED ENJOYED TAKEN DOWN OR BUILT OR ALTERED IN ANY MANNER WHATSOEVER OR PERMIT FURTHER BUILDINGS TO BE ERECTED UPON THE SAID PLOT OF LAND FOR LIKE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND UPON FURTHER TRUST TO MORTGAGE OR SELL THE SAID LAND WITH BUILDINGS THEREON.
Area of benefit
THORNTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hall Garth Farm
Thornton
Melbourne
YORK
YO42 4RZ
- Phone:
- 01759318955
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window