Governing document WREXHAM'S HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Charity Number: 508725
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 1980, 14 APRIL 1983, 11 APRIL 1985, 17 APRIL 1986, 25 APRIL 1991, 30 APRIL 1992 AND 17 JUNE 1993 AND 30 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PATIENTS IN THE WREXHAM MAELOR HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING A BROADCASTING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE DISTRICT OF WREXHAM MAELOR.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.