TOE TO TOE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF BOXING AND MARTIAL ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH COACHING, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND ASSOCIATED FITNESS ACTIVITIES. THE AIM OF INCREASING AND ENCOURAGING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AMONG ADULTS, CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE AND SPECIFIC USER GROUPS (IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH DISABILITIES) IN FLINTSHIRE, WALES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Flintshire
Governance
- 28 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Ashcroft | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG STOCKHAM | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARETH ROBINSON | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.96k | £67.97k | £37.01k | £36.31k | £38.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.58k | £44.77k | £45.28k | £46.82k | £29.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.46k | £21.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2024 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2024 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF BOXING AND MARTIAL ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH COACHING, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND ASSOCIATED FITNESS ACTIVITIES WITH THE AIM OF INCREASING AND ENCOURAGING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AMONG ADULTS, CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE AND SPECIFIC USER GROUPS (IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH DISABILITIES) IN FLINTSHIRE, WALES.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Toe to Toe
Toe 2 Toe
North Road
HOLYWELL
Flintshire
CH8 7TQ
- Phone:
- 07563255791
- Email:
- toe2toefitness@outlook.com
- Website:
-
TBC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window