1ST FAIRFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide scouting activities for children from 6 years of age to young adults in the fairfield area of Stockton - on - Tees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 15 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
rachel scott | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
alexandra marshall | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
jennifer aird | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
john potts | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
christine scott | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
simon atkinson | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE BRADSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
david henderson | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET NORTH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.50k | £22.06k | £12.70k | £13.69k | £24.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £776 | £17.36k | £42.38k | £9.61k | £19.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.67k | £18.34k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLS OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 WINDERMERE ROAD
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 4LY
- Phone:
- 07999849340
- Email:
- david.henderson112@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window