KIDS SPACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kids Space exists to enable disadvantaged children and young people to learn a range of new skills through challenging and stimulating activities in a safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 24 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHANA RUCHI EICHENSTEIN | Chair | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gershon Leitner | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RIVKA LIPSHUTZ | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEHEZKEL BENZION WASSERSTRUM | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.75k | £38.00k | £53.49k | £97.85k | £115.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.89k | £26.77k | £61.50k | £100.29k | £117.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (II) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. (III)ANY OTHER PURPOSE CURRENTLY RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 MOUNDFIELD ROAD
LONDON
N16 6DT
- Phone:
- 020880000848
- Email:
- kidspace48@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window