Financial history FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S JUNIOR SCHOOL RUDDINGTON

Charity number: 1170095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.03k £1.37k £9.98k £11.48k £9.70k
Total expenditure £2.43k £4.16k £9.03k £10.76k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A