MD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is for young people in the UK and Ireland to have access to free mental health support. Mdeducational Foundation endeavors to provide wellbeing support by placing qualified practitioner staffing within an educational setting (schools, colleges, sixth forms), with those predominantly benefiting being aged 16-18.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 15 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRIAM DERVAN | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TARQUIN SCADDING-HUNT | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £10.62k | £169.01k | £143.56k | £400.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £10.62k | £169.01k | £133.84k | £469.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVISION OF GRANTS TO YOUNG PERSONS REQUIRING TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO) EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND WORK EXPERIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dykes
Henfield Common North
HENFIELD
West Sussex
BN5 9RL
- Phone:
- 01273 254 130
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window