THE WOMAN AND CHILD IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities are currently paying for educational needs for 60 underprivileged children in Shurugwi, Gokwe , Masvingo and Zvimba in Zimbabwe. Provide Food hampers to children's homes , elderly homes. The organisation also provides underwear and sanitary wear, to female inmates in prisons. End domestic Violence Workshops in Slough. Also about to start a Quasi farming project with women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 April 2017: CIO registration
- THE WOMAN IN NEED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Samushonga | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS HAZEL CHIDO RAMWI | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fadzai Vannessah Appolonia Ramwi | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
FARISAYI MARJORY KNOTT F.M | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edeline Nyasha MOYO | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KANISIO RAMWI | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.70k | £2.51k | £15.56k | £1.37k | £4.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £4.60k | £8.40k | £10.42k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS LIVING IN ZIMBABWE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND SHELTER. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN LIVING IN ZIMBABWE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL FEES, THE FUNDING OF SCHOOL PROJECTS, STATIONERY AND UNIFORMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Davy Road
New Rossington
Doncaster
- Phone:
- 07477363783
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window