LYDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for maintenance of fabric of Village Hall and other community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rutland
Governance
- 31 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MICHAEL HORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Georgene Hill | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gryce | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ormrod | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Taylor | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cherry House | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL SHARPE | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY RIDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WESTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ROS HORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRIS CLEMINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.74k | £14.20k | £19.91k | £8.42k | £6.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.94k | £6.87k | £4.32k | £10.26k | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 27 MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LYDDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 COLLEY RISE
LYDDINGTON
OAKHAM
LE15 9LL
- Phone:
- 01572822789
- Email:
- jim.horton0@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window