Trustees LYDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 508736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MICHAEL HORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Georgene Hill | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gryce | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ormrod | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Taylor | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cherry House | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL SHARPE | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY RIDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WESTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ROS HORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRIS CLEMINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.