THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF EMBALMERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give grants to individuals to help them at time of hardship, to study for the BIE exam. Educational payments are made to assist members of the BIE and the public better understand embalming and the learning of embalming skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2017: CIO registration
- 25 November 2017: Funds received from 202915 THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF EMBALMERS MEMORIAL TRUST
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LAMBERT KAYE | Chair | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Charles Stewart Lindsay | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD GILES WILLIAM-PRICE | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY SHIPLEY | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PAUL LIDDLE | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £9.01k | £8.90k | £9.56k | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £1.83k | £7.36k | £4.43k | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN EMBALMING AND RELATED SUBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) AWARDING GRANTS TOWARDS TUITION FEES AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR THOSE WISHING TO STUDY EMBALMING IF THROUGH POVERTY THEY WOULD BE OTHERWISE PREVENTED FROM DOING SO; AND (B) AWARDING ANNUAL PRIZES TO THOSE STUDENTS WHO ACHIEVE THE HIGHEST RESULTS IN EMBALMING EXAMINATIONS; AND 2) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR FOLLOWING A BEREAVEMENT. 3) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 YEW TREE CLOSE
SILSOE
BEDFORD
MK45 4EQ
- Phone:
- 01525860117
- Email:
- michaelliddle914@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window