CHIPS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of disability in children by the provision of specialist equipment including powered wheelchairs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 May 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA GLORIA LINDSAY | Chair | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ian Hunter | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stewart Willcock | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter McNally | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Rubenstein | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Jones | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.30k | £170.23k | £142.46k | £388.00k | £181.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £375.86k | £216.65k | £176.13k | £213.96k | £293.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 April 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 April 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 1899 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY IN CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT INCLUDING POWERED WHEELCHAIRS
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 CAMLET WAY
BARNET
EN4 0NL
- Phone:
- 02084411455
- Email:
- Chipscharity@AOL.com
- Website:
-
WWW.chipscharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window