GVCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and help young people in Garden Village, Wrexham and the surrounding area through: The provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life; Providing support and activities to develop skills, capacities and capabilities to enable participation in society as responsible individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £136,237 from 2 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 16 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beth Williams-morris | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pryce | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dale Evans | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.51k | £369.34k | £573.46k | £296.37k | £294.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.59k | £368.68k | £506.82k | £300.33k | £316.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £77.91k | £88.58k | N/A | N/A | £136.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £98.75k | £402.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £171.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £506.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 December 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 December 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 February 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2022 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN GARDEN VILLAGE, WREXHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GARDEN VILLAGE, WREXHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YOUNG PERSONS CENTRE
WATS DYKE WAY
WREXHAM
LL11 2TE
- Phone:
- 01978 363600
- Email:
- enquiries@gvhub.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window