UNIVERSITY OF WITHYWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsoring young people so they can continue their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- India
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
Governance
- 20 February 2017: CIO registration
- THE SPONSORSHIP FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMLYN GLYNDWR MATHIAS | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER RONALD JONES | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JEWELL SUBOW | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE IN POVERTY OR AT SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 16-30 IN DEVELOPING COMMUNITIES WITHIN ASIA AND AFRICA, BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR THEIR EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 HIGHWORTH ROAD
BRISTOL
BS4 4AG
- Phone:
- 07539310711
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window