Financial history REVERT2REALITY

Charity Number: 1168971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/07/2020 26/07/2021 26/07/2022 26/07/2023 26/07/2024
Total gross income £38.17k £68.12k £78.02k £37.67k £59.25k
Total expenditure £36.57k £43.33k £48.05k £55.26k £67.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £19.25k N/A N/A