REVERT2REALITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See summary
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2016: Standard registration
- R2R (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reece Byfield | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Chambers | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohbub Alom | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALIYA IQBAL | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/07/2020 | 26/07/2021 | 26/07/2022 | 26/07/2023 | 26/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.17k | £68.12k | £78.02k | £37.67k | £59.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.57k | £43.33k | £48.05k | £55.26k | £67.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £19.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 July 2024 | 11 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2024 | 11 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR ISLAMIC FAITH AND CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 2
736 B LEA BRIDGE ROAD
LEYTON
LONDON
E10 6AW
- Phone:
- 0208 610 9393
- Email:
- info@revert2reality.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window