GREATER MANCHESTER SOMALI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education, employment and training for young people and their families. To establish a Somali Youth Centre to provide social and recreational activities as well as facilities for the well-being of young people, parents and the local community. To act as an umbrella organization for Somali voluntary and community sector organizations in Greater Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDIRAHMAN SAID ALI | Chair | 11 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Abdigafar Muse | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahim Ahmed | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Hassan | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libaan Ali | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED DIRYE JAMA | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
AHMED MOHAMUD | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420 | £65 | £20 | £1.03k | £1.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289 | £67 | £0 | £987 | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 May 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 May 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE OF SOMALI ORIGIN RESIDENT IN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY REPRESENTATION SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE THROUGH ACCREDITED ADVISERS AS WELL AS USING QUALIFIED TRAINERS TO PROVIDE TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN CHARITABLE NEED TO ENABLE THEM ACQUIRE EMPLOYABLE SKILLS AND QUALIFICATIONS, IMPROVE THEIR JOB PROSPECTS OR SET UP A BUSINESS AND EARN ENOUGH INCOME TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING AND HELP THEIR COMMUNITIES. 2. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE OF SOMALI ORIGIN RESIDENT IN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES FOR UNDERACHIEVING CHILDREN IN CHARITABLE NEED AT KEY STAGE 1 TO 4 LEVELS OF UK SCHOOL CURRICULUM AS WELL AS PROVISION OF ADULT EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moss Side Millennium Powerhouse
140 Raby Street
MANCHESTER
M14 4SL
- Phone:
- 07733708628
- Email:
- gmsca16@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window