Financial history ARSHA KULA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1171708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.97k £5.34k £1.93k £15.57k £46.42k
Total expenditure £4.70k £2.58k £3.61k £7.68k £49.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A