MR GRAYSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research and development into reducing stillbirths throughout the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 November 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT ALAN MOON | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA ELIZABETH MOON | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/11/2018 | 28/11/2019 | 28/11/2020 | 28/11/2021 | 28/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £50.00k | £1.00k | £12.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £49.50k | £920 | £11.50k | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days | |
Annual return | 28 November 2022 | 16 June 2024 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2022 | 16 June 2024 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 November 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 November 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 November 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2019 | 17 October 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO ARE PARENTS TO BE OR THOSE WHO HAVE LOST A CHILD TO STILL BIRTH BY:- (A)PROVIDING A 24/7 FREE PHONE HELPLINE WITH VOLUNTARY DOCTORS, NURSES AND MIDWIVES AT THE END OF THE PHONE TO PROVIDE FREE HELP AND ADVICE; (B)TO PROVIDE A SAFE HOME CARE PACK DURING PREGNANCY; (C)TO PROVIDE A PRECIOUS 'ANGELS IN HEAVEN' MEMORY PACK FOR THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE LOSS OF A SON OR DAUGHTER; (D)TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO REDUCING THE NUMBER OF STILLBIRTHS IN THE UK; (E)TO DEVELOP A MOBILE PHONE APPLICATION THAT WILL HELP REDUCE THE NUMBER OF STILLBIRTHS AND PROVIDE ADVICE; AND (F)TO PROVIDE A FREE COUNSELLING SERVICE. 2)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE BURIAL COSTS FOR THEIR STILLBORN BABIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mill
Tregonning Road
Truro
Cornwall
TR3 7FG
- Phone:
- 07445378706
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window