Financial history NEW WAY FORWARD

Charity number: 508746
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £43.61k £35.46k £60.22k £33.57k £33.57k
Total expenditure £41.76k £42.00k £44.88k £51.65k £42.93k
Income from government contracts N/A £12.90k £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £16.00k