THE CRISPIN HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1170107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Crispin Hall Trust has 19 rooms and a main hall, which are let out for a variety of community, retail and commercial purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £156,475
Total expenditure: £223,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 2016: CIO registration
  • 19 February 2019: Funds received from 1137036 CRISPIN COMMUNITY FOCUS
  • 27 January 2025: Funds received from 304646-1 GILLETT TRUST FOR GEOLOGY
  • 27 January 2025: Funds received from 304646 STREET CLUB AND INSTITUTE (CRISPIN HALL)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • STREET CLUB AND INSTITUTE (CRISPIN HALL) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEAN MARIE HOWARD Trustee 27 August 2021
THE FRIENDS OF STRODE THEATRE
Received: On time
Elizabeth Leyshon Trustee 11 June 2021
None on record
Cllr Martin Lovell Trustee 10 November 2016
STREET LIBRARY TRUST
Received: On time
SOMERSET BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
C AND J CLARK LIMITED EMPLOYEES 1922 TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROGER AND SARAH BANCROFT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
P AND M LOVELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST
Received: On time
CLARK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WILLIAM ROGER CLARK Trustee 10 November 2016
STREET LIBRARY TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOSEPH AND FRANCES CLARK TRUST
Received: 30 days late
RICHARD BANCROFT CLARK Trustee 10 November 2016
WALTON PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
NATHAN CLARK 1984 CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE CLAVERHAM MEETING HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOSEPH AND FRANCES CLARK TRUST
Received: 30 days late
CLARK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
John Bancroft Clark Trustee 10 November 2016
GREENBANK POOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £143.01k £254.11k £273.94k £720.92k £156.48k
Total expenditure £232.87k £205.17k £261.43k £180.24k £223.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £153.50k £55.43k £31.27k £35.63k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £608.46k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £111.89k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £580 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £180.24k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £8.41k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 June 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 05 June 2024 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 10 July 2023 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 10 July 2023 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 June 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 June 2021 110 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crispin Hall
83 High Street
STREET
BA16 0EZ
Phone:
01458 656885