FRIENDS OF HOLMEWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Holmewood undertake regular activities to promote good relations between pupils, parents and staff and fundraise to provide additional facilities to benefit the pupils of the school that would not be funded through normal school budget. We hold annual fundraising events including Christmas Fairs, Quiz Nights and Summer events for all staff, parents and pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 13 September 2016: Standard registration
- FOH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chelsea Crathern | Chair | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Mole | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ala El-Kour | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Faith | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Clary | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.53k | £6.14k | £18.96k | £88.64k | £28.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.70k | £6.40k | £13.18k | £113.17k | £29.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holmewood House School
Barrow Lane
Langton Green
Tunbridge Wells
TN3 0EB
- Phone:
- 01892860000
- Email:
- friends@holmewoodhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window