Financial history MILL HILL U3A

Charity number: 1170622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.94k £14.18k £18.11k £55.64k £59.96k
Total expenditure £47.62k £10.73k £20.86k £47.28k £56.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A