THE SHEPHERDESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Shepherdess aims to encourage and motivate people of all age from the ethnic minorities who are struggling to overcome rejection as a result of past life experiences. Organise community based workshops across Colchester and Essex in the main area of Healthcare education and poverty alleviation. Providing food and giving out old clothes overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Benin
- Cameroon
- Congo
- Gabon
- Kenya
- Nigeria
Governance
- 20 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iyabode Adedeji-Tiwo | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
christine winsala | Trustee | 11 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLUDAMILARE WASIU LAWAL | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.92k | £3.00k | £21.52k | £27.50k | £9.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.98k | £3.00k | £20.87k | £27.17k | £9.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.17k | £20.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Carneige Court
Burgess Springs
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1DG
- Phone:
- 07944359757
- Email:
- shepherdessc@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
theshepherdess.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window